EP0321650 - Dental calculus inhibiting compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | ||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amjad, Zahid 32611 Redwood Boulevard Avon Lake Ohio 44012 / US | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113194.0 | 13.08.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | US19870135803 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: US 135803 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321650 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/18 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8164 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Präparate zum Verhindern der Zahnsteinbildung | [1989/26] | English: | Dental calculus inhibiting compositions | [1989/26] | French: | Compositions pour l'inhibition du tarte dentaire | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2027342 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [X]US4243658 (CHANG ROBERT W H); | [Y]GB2052984 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [Y]EP0105983 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROD INC [US]) |