EP0311770 - Device for respiration therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raupach, Udo, Dr. Erlenstrasse 25 D-91477 Markt Bibart / DE | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roedern, Giso Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr. Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113210.4 | 16.08.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | DE19873727134 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727134 | [1989/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311770 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311770 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311770 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A63B23/00 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
A61M15/0086 (EP);
A61M15/00 (EP);
A61M15/0016 (EP);
A63B23/18 (EP);
A61M15/009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/16] | A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Atemtherapiegerät | [1989/16] | English: | Device for respiration therapy | [1989/16] | French: | Dispositif pour thérapie respiratoire | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Request for further processing for: | 08.07.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.05.1993 | ES | 19.05.1993 | FR | 19.05.1993 | GB | 19.05.1993 | GR | 19.05.1993 | IT | 19.05.1993 | NL | 19.05.1993 | SE | 19.05.1993 | AT | 16.08.1993 | CH | 31.08.1993 | LI | 31.08.1993 | LU | 31.08.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
ES | 19.05.1993 | ||
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
GR | 19.05.1993 | ||
IT | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
AT | 16.08.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.08.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
GR | 19.05.1993 | ||
IT | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
AT | 16.08.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.08.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
IT | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
AT | 16.08.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
AT | 16.08.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
FR | 08.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
GB | 19.05.1993 | ||
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | BE | 19.05.1993 | |
NL | 19.05.1993 | ||
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | NL | 19.05.1993 | |
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 19.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3635214 (RAND WILLIAM A, et al); | [Y]US3826247 (RUSKIN A, et al); | [Y]US4231375 (BOEHRINGER JOHN R, et al); | [Y]US4403616 (KING GEORGE E [US]); | [Y]DE8625936U |