EP0313745 - Tracking control circuit for an optical pick-up [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Heinz-Jörg Terra Wohnpark 9 D-7730 VS-Marbach / DE | [1989/18] | Application number, filing date | 88113303.7 | 17.08.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | DE19873732899 | 30.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732899 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313745 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313745 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
G11B7/0946 (EP,US);
G11B7/095 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Spurregelkreis für eine optische Abtastvorrichtung | [1989/18] | English: | Tracking control circuit for an optical pick-up | [1989/18] | French: | Circuit de commande suivi de piste pour un transducteur optique | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP60010429 [ ]; | JP59094250 [ ]; | [A]GB2029051 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]US4484319 (KOISHI KENJI [JP], et al); | [Y]GB2154030 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]EP0272873 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 127 (P-360)[1850], 31. Mai 1985, Seite 103; & JP-A-60 010 429 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 19-01-1985, & JP60010429 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 211 (P-303)[1648], 26. September 1984; & JP-A-59 094 250 (HITACHI SEIKAKUSHO K.K.) 30-05-1984, & JP59094250 A 00000000 |