EP0355177 - Apparatus for the contactless desintegration of concrements in a living thing body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassler, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Flugweg 3 D-8525 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Erhard, Ing. grad. Heuwaagstrasse 20 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1990/09] | Application number, filing date | 88113375.5 | 17.08.1988 | [1990/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355177 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, G10K11/30 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
G10K11/30 (EP,US);
A61B17/2256 (EP,US);
A61B17/2258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum berührungslosen Zertrümmern von Konkrementen im Körper eines Lebewesens | [1990/09] | English: | Apparatus for the contactless desintegration of concrements in a living thing body | [1990/09] | French: | Appareil pour la destruction à distance dans le corps d'un être vivant | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/42] | 31.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3913061 (GREEN PHILIP S); | [A]US4131021 (MEZRICH REUBEN S, et al); | [AD]DE2722252 ; | [A]FR2591467 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]); | [A]EP0254104 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |