Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
29.11.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] |
15.10.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] |
25.02.1992 | First examination report | |
11.04.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |
24.08.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 11.10.1989 [1989/41] |
14.01.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] |