EP0354270 - Transport container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELDBINDER & BECKMANN oHG Gutenbergstrasse 12 D-21423 Winsen / DE | [1990/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schadagies, Hendrik, Dipl.-Ing. Haselhorsthof 24 D-2090 Winsen/Luhe / DE | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/07] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113463.9 | 19.08.1988 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | DE19880010269U | 12.08.1988 Original published format: DE 8810269 U | [1990/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354270 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/56, B65G65/23, B60P3/24 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
B65D88/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/07] | Title | German: | Transport-Container | [1990/07] | English: | Transport container | [1990/07] | French: | Conteneur de transport | [1990/07] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/14] | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.09.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3378302 ; | [Y]WO8401401 ; | [YD]DE2454606 ; | [A]EP0242820 |