EP0305823 - Distribution device for multicomponent hair cosmetics, especially hair dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Gottfried-August-Bürger-Strasse 10 D-4006 Erdkrath / DE | 02 /
Thiele, Klaus Rugenweg 5 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113482.9 | 19.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873728876 | 29.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3728876 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305823 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A45D24/22 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
A45D24/22 (EP,KR,US);
A45D19/026 (KR);
A45D19/0066 (KR);
A45D19/028 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, SE [1991/16] |
Former [1989/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abgabe mehrkomponentiger haarkosmetischer Produkte, insbesondere Haarfärbemittel | [1989/10] | English: | Distribution device for multicomponent hair cosmetics, especially hair dyes | [1989/10] | French: | Dispositif de distribution de produits cosmétiques pour les cheveux, en particulier de substances colorantes | [1989/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/42] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1645038 (BORER WILLIAM J); | [A]US2225282 (TABORSKI ALFRED F); | [X]US2446398 (WILSON CHARLEY S); | [A]US2819723 (ROGER MEYER); | [A]DE2163878 (SCHLEY ERHARD AXEL); | [X]DE2824525 (ROEHM FRITZ); | [A]DE3029691 (SCHMITZ WOLFGANG [DE]) |