EP0304088 - A prepolymerization process for producing a conjugated diene compound prepolymer solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hattori, Yasuo 4-14-203, Wakabadai Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kangawa / JP | 02 /
Kitagawa, Yuichi Moakurest Tamagawagakuen 3-208, 2864-3 Nara-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113526.3 | 19.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | JP19870204277 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20427787 | JP19870204278 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20427887 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304088 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304088 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F295/00, C08F279/02, C08F4/52, C08F4/50, C08F36/04, C08F212/02 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
C08F295/00 (EP,US);
C08F2/60 (KR);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F36/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F36/04, C08F4/50 (EP,US);
C08F36/04, C08F4/54 (US,EP);
C08F36/04, C08F4/545 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/08] | Title | German: | Präpolymerisationsverfahren zur Herstellung einer Lösung einer konjugierten Dienverbindung | [1989/08] | English: | A prepolymerization process for producing a conjugated diene compound prepolymer solution | [1989/08] | French: | Procédé de prépolymérisation pour préparer une solution d'un composé d'un diène conjugué | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60104112 ; | [XD]US4575538 (HSIEH HENRY L [US], et al); | [XD]US3299178 (SHORT JAMES N, et al); | [A]GB2029426 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]EP0091287 (ENICHEM ELASTOMERS [GB]); | [A]US3644587 (FINBERG ARNE) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 4, 7th October 1985, page 38, abstract no. 105820r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 104 112 (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) 08-06-1985, & JP60104112 A 00000000 |