EP0304829 - Frame for windows, doors or the like and profile for its fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIRMA CHR. AHRENS Eichkamp 22 D-24116 Kiel / DE | [1989/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahrens, Johannes Christoph Seehundweg 9 D-2300 Kiel 17 / DE | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Döring, Rudolf Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Döring Dipl.-Phys. Dr. J. Fricke Jasperallee 1a D-38102 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Döring, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Döring Dipl.-Phys. Dr. J. Fricke Jasperallee 1a D-38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113550.3 | 20.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | DE19873728023 | 22.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3728023 | [1989/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304829 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304829 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304829 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/08 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
E06B3/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Rahmen für Fenster, Türen oder dgl. und Profilstrang für seine Herstellung | [1989/09] | English: | Frame for windows, doors or the like and profile for its fabrication | [1989/09] | French: | Châssis pour fenêtres, portes ou des choses pareilles et profil pour sa fabrication | [1989/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.1992 | GB | 20.08.1992 | CH | 31.08.1992 | LI | 31.08.1992 | [1994/25] |
Former [1993/47] | GB | 20.08.1992 | |
CH | 31.08.1992 | ||
LI | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 31.08.1992 | |
LI | 31.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1022554 (MENUISERIE IND ET DU BATIMENT); | [A]DE3107986 (HANS STARK FA [DE]); | [AD]DE8435701U ; | [A]DE3509101 (ROHLFS GUENTER) |