blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0307657

EP0307657 - Motor vehicle headlight [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.1995
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.11.1995 [1995/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1989/12]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GmbH
Wernerstrasse 1
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lindae, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Brühl 23
D-7250 Leonberg / DE
02 / Neumann, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Köllenbergstrasse 35
D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE
03 / Perthus, Peter
Artusweg 21
D-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE
[1989/12]
Application number, filing date88113557.820.08.1988
[1989/12]
Priority number, dateDE1987373123217.09.1987         Original published format: DE 3731232
[1989/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0307657
Date:22.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0307657
Date:14.03.1990
Language:DE
[1990/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0307657
Date:23.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:F21M3/08
[1989/12]
CPC:
F21S41/335 (EP,US); F21S41/164 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1989/12]
TitleGerman:Abblendlicht-Scheinwerfer[1994/47]
English:Motor vehicle headlight[1989/12]
French:Projecteur pour véhicule automobile[1989/12]
Former [1989/12]Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere Scheinwerfer für Kraftfahrzeuge
Examination procedure26.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
01.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1994Fee for grant paid
11.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3492474  (YAMAGUCHI SEIICHI, et al);
 [X]US4481563  (SNYDER EDWARD A [US], et al);
 [A]US4530042  (CIBIE PIERRE [FR], et al);
 [AD]DE3527391  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]DE3531223  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.