EP0319652 - An insulated container having a three-dimensional exterior caricature with a pivoted hat which serves as the container cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Puppet Kooler Industries, Inc. 15325 Magnolia Boulevard, Suite 105 Sherman Oaks, California 91403 / US | [1989/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayon, Lance C. 14900 San Jose Street Mission Hills, California 91435 / US | 02 /
Lipman, Steven B. 15325 Magnolia Boulevard,105 Sherman Oaks, California 91403 / US | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113621.2 | 22.08.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | US19870129836 | 08.12.1987 Original published format: US 129836 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319652 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47G23/04 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B65D81/3886 (EP,US);
B65D81/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Isolierbehälter mit einer aussen befindlichen 3-dimensionalen Karikatur mit einem klappbaren Hut, der als Gefässdeckel dient | [1989/24] | English: | An insulated container having a three-dimensional exterior caricature with a pivoted hat which serves as the container cover | [1989/24] | French: | Récipient isolé avec une caricature externe tridimensionnelle avec un chapeau pivotant servant comme couvercle | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/22] | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.01.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   09.02.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE79924 ; | [A]US2024553 (RADCLIFF TISDALL HARRY); | [A]FR878947 ; | [A]DE8605008U |