Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |
07.09.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
16.10.1990 | First examination report | |
28.09.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] |
01.04.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |