EP0305865 - Twist drill for tough plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIVERSIFIED ELECTRONICS, INC. (an Indiana corporation) 1321 Edgar Street P.O. Box 1140 Evansville Indiana 47706-1140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states DIVERSIFIED ELECTRONICS, INC. (an Indiana corporation) 1321 Edgar Street P.O. Box 1140 Evansville Indiana 47706-1140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Roger S. 825 Ravenswood Drive Evansville Indiana / US | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113728.5 | 23.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | US19870093375 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: US 93375 | [1989/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305865 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
B23B51/02 (EP,US);
B26F1/16 (KR);
B23B2226/61 (EP,US);
B23B2251/04 (EP,US);
B23B2251/043 (EP,US);
B23B2251/18 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9097 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | Spiralbohrer für harte Kunststoffe | [1989/10] | English: | Twist drill for tough plastics | [1989/10] | French: | Foret hélicoidal pour matières plastiques dures | [1989/10] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1989 | New documents discovered [1989/30] | 04.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/36] | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2105664 [ ] (REINHOLDT AS H); | US2859645 [ ] (EMMONS JOSEPH V, et al); | US2859695 [ ] (EDWARD ROLLE); | DD149321 [ ] (SCHULZE GUENTER); | US2936658 [ ] (RILEY OSCAR L) | [A] - SOVIET ENGINEERING RESEARCH |