EP0330728 - Method and connection apparatus for optical fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borsuk, Leslie Morton 11622 Kensington Road Los Alamitos, Ca 90720 / US | 02 /
Coutts, Bruce P.O. Box 2162 Costa Mesa, Ca 92628 / US | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Vaufrouard, John Charles Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [1989/36] | Application number, filing date | 88113737.6 | 24.08.1988 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | US19880142650 | 11.01.1988 Original published format: US 142650 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330728 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330728 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/32, G02B6/26, C03B37/14 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/2552 (EP);
G02B6/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anschlussvorrichtung für optische Fasern | [1989/36] | English: | Method and connection apparatus for optical fibres | [1989/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de raccordement pour fibres optiques | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 03.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/51] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58102911 ; | [XP]DE3740414 ; | [XP]EP0270045 ; | [AD]EP0022374 ; | [AP]EP0278213 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 206 (P-222)[1351], 10th September 1983; & JP-A-58 102 911 (FUJITSU K.K.) 18-06-1983, & JP58102911 A 00000000 |