EP0304908 - Process for the preparation of octahedral silver chloride-containing emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tufano, Thomas Peter 1425 Stapler Place Wilmington Delaware 19806 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113848.1 | 25.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870090555 | 28.08.1987 Original published format: US 90555 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304908 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304908 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/07, // C07D251/48, C07D239/48, C07D487/04 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
G03C1/035 (EP,US);
C07D239/48 (EP,US);
C07D251/48 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C1/07 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03582 (EP,US);
Y10S430/167 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/09] | G03C1/02, // C07D251/48, C07D239/48, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [1989/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von oktaedrisches Silberchlorid enthaltenden Emulsionen | [1989/09] | English: | Process for the preparation of octahedral silver chloride-containing emulsions | [1989/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation des émulsions contenant du chlorure d'argent octahédrique | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 11.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2932185 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]EP0034038 (DU PONT [US]) | [A] - BERICHTE DER BUNSENGESELLSCHAFT FÜR PHYSIKALISCHE CHEMIE, vol. 69, no. 9/10, September/October 1965, page 911, Verlag Chemie, Weinheim, DE; E. MOISAR: "Adsorption und Kristalltracht der Silberhalogenide" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE, vol. 21, no. 6, November/December 1973, pages 39-51, The Royal Photographic Society of Great Britain, London, GB; F.H. CLAES et al.: "Crystal habit modification of AgCl by impurities determining the solvation" |