EP0313759 - Traversing gear for tanks with a turret gun mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegmann & Co. GmbH August-Bode-Strasse 1 D-34127 Kassel / DE | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schieche, Jost Gartenstrasse 4 D-3507 Baunatal / DE | 02 /
Wallwey, Erich Bethovenstrasse 17 D-3502 Vellmar / DE | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, et al Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, et al Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113931.5 | 26.08.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | DE19873736262 | 27.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3736262 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313759 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313759 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313759 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F41A27/18, F41A27/22, F16H57/12, F16H37/08 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
F16H57/12 (EP);
F16H37/0826 (EP);
F41A27/20 (EP);
F16H2057/122 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/52] | F41F21/14, F41F21/02, F16H57/12, F16H37/08 | ||
Former IPC [1989/18] | F41F21/14, F41F21/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, LI, NL [1989/18] | Title | German: | Seitenrichtantrieb für Kampf-fahrzeuge mit Panzerturm | [1989/18] | English: | Traversing gear for tanks with a turret gun mounting | [1989/18] | French: | Mécanisme de pointage en direction pour des chars comportant un canon en tourelle | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB633971 (FREDERICK ERRINGTON, et al); | [A]US3166952 (LANG RICHARD E); | [A]US3238803 (FRANCOIS DURAND); | [A]EP0059921 (PIETZSCH IBP GMBH [DE]) | [A] - THE TOOL AND MANUFACTURING ENGINEER vol. 56, no. 2, Februar 1966, U.S.A. Seiten 99 - 100; "To prevent backlash" | [A] - IBM Technical disclosure bulletin vol. 23, no. 3, August 1980, U.S.A. Seite 1105 T.G.Survant: "Anti-backlash motor mounting" |