EP0306786 - Permanent hanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWK Regler und Kompensatoren GmbH Postfach 11 62, Lorenzstrasse 6 D-76288 Stutensee-Blankenloch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states IWK Regler und Kompensatoren GmbH Postfach 11 62, Lorenzstrasse 6 D-76288 Stutensee-Blankenloch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzhausen, Wieland, Dr. Ernstring 8 D-8351 Auerbach / DE | 02 /
Rogg, Hermann Blumenstrasse 17 D-7513 Stutensee 1 / DE | 03 /
Jäger, Jürgen Waldhornstrasse 4 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114013.1 | 27.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | DE19870012738U | 22.09.1987 Original published format: DE 8712738 U | DE19870012160U | 08.09.1987 Original published format: DE 8712160 U | [1989/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0306786 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306786 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/20 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
F16L3/2053 (EP);
F16L3/2056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/11] | Title | German: | Konstanthänger | [1989/11] | English: | Permanent hanger | [1989/11] | French: | Objet pour suspension constante | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 26.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2903010 [ ] (MANNESMANN AG); | DE2855978 [ ]; | DE2162305 [ ]; | FR2286330 [ ] (AQUITAINE CHAUDRONNERIES TUYAU [FR]); | DE3315698 [ ] (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) |