EP0306789 - Procedure and device for longitudinal partition of billets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 D-60314 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grohmann, Paul Erlaufstrasse 23 A-2344 Maria-Enzersdorf / AT | [1989/11] | Application number, filing date | 88114025.5 | 27.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | DE19873730150 | 09.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3730150 | [1989/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0306789 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306789 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23K7/00 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
B22D11/126 (EP,US);
B23K7/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/11] | B23K7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Längsteilen von Giesssträngen | [1989/11] | English: | Procedure and device for longitudinal partition of billets | [1989/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour partager longitudinalement des boins | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 01.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3532010 (AUTE AUTOGENE TECH [CH]); | [A]EP0225481 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP59153572 | JP5970464 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, n° 284 (M-348) (1721) 26. Dezember 1984, & JP -A - 59 153 572 (HITACHI ZOSEN KK) 01.09.1984, & JP59153572 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, n° 177 (M-317) (1614) 15. August 1984, & JP - A - 59 70464 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) 20.04.1984, & JP5970464 A 00000000 |