EP0308697 - Wall feed-through for conduits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG In den Stegwiesen 18 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG In den Stegwiesen 18 D-89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states PLASTOFORM GMBH & CO. KG Burgstrasse 25 D-4973 Vlotho / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauff, Werner Herlsbühlstrasse 19 D-7925 Ballmertshofen / DE | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Fay, Hermann, et al PAe Fay Dziewior & Hentrich Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Fay, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Dipl.-Phys. Hermann Fay und Dr. Joachim Dziewior Postfach 17 67 D-89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114174.1 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | DE19873731583 | 19.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3731583 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308697 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308697 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308697 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/22, F16L5/02 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
H02G3/22 (EP);
F16L5/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | H02G3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Mauerdurchführung für Leitungen | [1989/13] | English: | Wall feed-through for conduits | [1989/13] | French: | Traversée de mur pour conduits | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1196447 (GUSTAV F J SCHROEDER); | [A]US4002345 (JANKOWIAK ROMAN, et al); | [AD]DE2901266 (HAUFF WERNER KG); | [A]DE8406807U |