EP0307718 - Modular latticework structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUATTROCCHIO S.r.L. Via Isonzo 51 15100 Alessandria / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states QUATTROCCHIO S.r.L. Via Isonzo 51 I-15100 Alessandria / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Pas, Jonathan Corso XII Marzo 39 I-20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
D'Urbino, Donato Corso XII Marzo 39 I-20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
Lomazzi, Paolo Corso XII Marzo 39 I-20129 Milano / IT | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 20151 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 I-20151 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88114182.4 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | IT19870000310 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: IT 31087 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307718 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307718 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/19 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
E04B1/1903 (EP,US);
E04B1/2403 (EP,US);
E04B1/1912 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1915 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1927 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1942 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1963 (EP,US);
E04B2001/2406 (EP,US);
E04B2001/2424 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Modulare Fachwerkkonstruktion | [1989/12] | English: | Modular latticework structure | [1989/12] | French: | Construction en treillis modulaire | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0079314 (VOCCA ALFONSO); | [A]DE8601249U ; | [A]FR2590144 (LACROIX BRUNO [FR]) |