Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] |
10.01.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] |
19.07.1990 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] |
24.01.1990 | First examination report | |
29.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.08.1989 [1989/33] |
14.01.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] |