EP0304960 - Rail grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORAM MAINTENANCE OF WAY, INC. 3900 Arrowhead Drive Hamel Minnesota 55340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states LORAM MAINTENANCE OF WAY, INC. 3900 Arrowhead Drive Hamel Minnesota 55340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vieau, Robert G. 4431 Urbandale Court Plymouth Minnesota 55446 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114215.2 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870091231 | 31.08.1987 Original published format: US 91231 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304960 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304960 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/17 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
E01B31/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Schienenschleifmaschine | [1989/09] | English: | Rail grinding machine | [1989/09] | French: | Machine à rectifier les rails | [1989/09] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/09: Teilanmeldung 90111777.0 eingereicht am 31/08/88 | EPB 1992/09: Divisional application 90111777.0 filed on 31/08/88 | EPB 1992/09: Demande divisionnaire 90111777.0 déposée le 31/08/88 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90111777.0 / EP0397215 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.06.1992 | [2004/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB776391 (KARL HEINZ SCHORLING); | [Y]GB1151010 (SPENO INTERNAT S A [CH]); | [A]FR2206409 (ELAUGEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4583327 (JAEGGI HANS P [CH]) |