EP0306028 - Gate leaf or door leaf consisting of one or several parts and equipped with a bar lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÖRMANN-GENK NV Woudstraat 2 3600 Winterslag - Genk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states HÖRMANN-GENK NV Woudstraat 2 B-3600 Winterslag - Genk / BE | ||
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states N.V. Hörmann-Belgie Woudstraat 2 B-3600 Winterslag - Genk / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Upheider Weg 94 D-4803 Steinhagen/Westf. / DE | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Flügel, Otto Flügel Preissner Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 D-81905 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 81 / DE | ||
Former [1989/10] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 D-81905 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114299.6 | 01.09.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873729366 | 02.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3729366 | DE19883801567 | 20.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3801567 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306028 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306028 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306028 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/04 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
E06B3/822 (EP);
E05B63/20 (EP);
E05C9/04 (EP);
E06B2003/7046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1989/21] |
Former [1989/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ein- oder mehrteiliges Tor- oder Türblatt mit einem Stangenschloss | [1989/10] | English: | Gate leaf or door leaf consisting of one or several parts and equipped with a bar lock | [1989/10] | French: | Vantail de portail ou vantail de porte composé d'un ou de plusieurs parties et muni d'une serrure à barre | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, ES, GB, GR, IT, LU, SE | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.10.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1988 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7804269U ; | [A]DE818855U ; | [A]DE3142959 (SCOVILL SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG [DE]); | [A]DE8133873U ; | [A]DE2758824 (HOERMANN BELGIE NV); | [A]DE2934062 (BRUNNER PETER) |