EP0306037 - Watch provided with a dial [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Granges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | ||
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | ||
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyrat, Clément Route de Bâle 9 CH-2525 Le Landeron / CH | 02 /
Dubois, Antoine Grande-Rue 18 CH-2400 Le Locle / CH | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 88114344.0 | 02.09.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | CH19870003390 | 03.09.1987 Original published format: CH 339087 | [1989/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0306037 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306037 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/14 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
G04B19/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/10] | Title | German: | Uhr mit einem Zifferblatt | [1989/10] | English: | Watch provided with a dial | [1989/10] | French: | Montre munie d'un cadran | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US554511 ; | [A]FR1338863 ; | [A]US3733809 (REITER E, et al); | [X]FR2212573 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS [JP]); | [A]EP0101663 |