EP0307740 - Device for sharpening paradental instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIKRONA AG Weingartenstrasse 8 CH-8957 Spreitenbach / CH | For all designated states Römhild, Ludwig, Dr. Am Kugelfeld 3 D-83471 Berchtesgaden / DE | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Erwin Gugelweg 15 CH-5115 Möriken / CH | 02 /
Römhild, Ludwig, Dr. Am Kugelfeld 3 D-8240 Berchtesgaden / DE | 03 /
Reinhard, Peter Weingartenstrasse 8 CH-8957 Spreitenbach / CH | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 88114399.4 | 03.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | CH19870003593 | 17.09.1987 Original published format: CH 359387 | [1989/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307740 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307740 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307740 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24B3/60 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
B24B3/605 (EP,US);
A61C19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/12] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Schärfen von Paradontalinstrumenten | [1989/12] | English: | Device for sharpening paradental instruments | [1989/12] | French: | Appareil pour l'affûtage d'instruments paradentaux | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1993
09.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE Roswitha Quétin Grauenbrunnenweg 18 D- 69181 Leimen / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1993
09.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE Roswitha Quétin Grauenbrunnenweg 18 D- 69181 Leimen / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1993
09.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE Roswitha Quétin Grauenbrunnenweg 18 D- 69181 Leimen / DE Opponent's representative Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | 30.08.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.12.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.01.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.08.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.09.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2578309 (KROCZEK ANTON M); | [A]EP0128829 (VILAR G ETS [FR]) | by applicant | US2578309 |