EP0357823 - Device for testing metallic work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magfoil & Inspektionstechniken GmbH Grootkoppel 29 D-2400 Lübeck / DE | [1990/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walther, Karl G. Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 35 D-5840 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
Walther, Ronald G. Rütscher Strasse 175, Zi. 201 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Leonard, Detlef Holweg 12 D-2406 Stockelsdorf / DE | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114674.0 | 08.09.1988 | [1990/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0357823 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/84, G01N27/85 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von metallischen Werkstücken | [1990/11] | English: | Device for testing metallic work pieces | [1990/11] | French: | Dispositif pour tester des pièces à usiner métalliques | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/52] | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3150303 [ ]; | DE3145090 [ ]; | DE3026540 [ ]; | DE2725816 [ ]; | DE2552985 [ ]; | GB1602643 [ ] |