Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] |
27.03.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
13.12.1990 | First examination report | |
17.05.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] |
11.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] |