EP0307881 - Floor nozzle of a vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murata, Yoshitaka 581, Kimura Gamo-cho Gamo-gun Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawakami, Hiroshi 11-4, Higashiokino 4-chome Yokaichi-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115004.9 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | JP19870231315 | 16.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23131587 | JP19870141339 | 16.09.1987 Original published format: JP 14133987 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307881 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307881 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307881 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/06 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
A47L9/066 (EP,US);
A47L9/02 (KR);
A47L9/06 (EP,US);
A47L9/0613 (EP,US);
A47L9/0653 (EP,US);
A47L9/0666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1989/12] | Title | German: | Staubsauger-Fussbodendüse | [1989/12] | English: | Floor nozzle of a vacuum cleaner | [1989/12] | French: | Suceur de plancher d'un aspirateur des poussières | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0125994 (OLIVIER GEORGES SA [FR]); | [A]US2717409 (DRAUDT HERBERT T); | [A]US2325739 (BROCK CLARENCE A); | [A]US2921331 (CLARENCE STEVENS); | [A]US2556022 (AMEN ATIYEH); | [A]DE487951 (REINHOLD GANSSMUELLER) |