EP0309811 - Document printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPUTER GESELLSCHAFT KONSTANZ MBH Max-Stromeyer-Strasse 116 78467 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states COMPUTER GESELLSCHAFT KONSTANZ MBH Max-Stromeyer-Strasse 116 D-78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piller, Gerhard Kilian-Weber-Strasse 16 D-7753 Allensbach / DE | 02 /
Schwarzbauer, Michael Stifterstrasse 47 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | [1993/52] |
Former [1989/14] | 01 /
Piller, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Kilian-Weber-Strasse 16 D-7753 Allensbach / DE | ||
02 /
Schwarzbauer, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Stifterstrasse 47 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/14] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115019.7 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | DE19873732622 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732622 | [1989/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309811 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309811 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309811 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/325 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
B41J2/325 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/14] | B41J3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken von Belegen | [1989/14] | English: | Document printer | [1989/14] | French: | Imprimante pour documents | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2333250 ; | [A]GB2069933 (TERAOKA SEIKOSHO KK); | [X]EP0111297 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]DE3438663 (RICOH KK [JP]) |