EP0358805 - Self-starting single-phase synchronous motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altenbernd, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Windhukstrasse 15 D-3000 Hannover 91 / DE | 02 /
Waehner, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Kettengasse 15 D-8700 Wuerzburg / DE | [1990/12] | Application number, filing date | 88115136.9 | 15.09.1988 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358805 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358805 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/18, H02K1/14, H02K37/16 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
H02K21/16 (EP);
H02K21/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1990/12] | Title | German: | Selbstanlaufender Einphasen-Synchronmotor | [1990/12] | English: | Self-starting single-phase synchronous motor | [1990/12] | French: | Moteur synchrone monophasé autodémarrant | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 29.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1874871U ; | [Y]US2827583 ; | [A]US2815460 ; | [A]EP0151497 ; | [A]DD204007 ; | [A]DE3208155 | [AD] - FEINWERKTECHN. & MESSTECHN. | Examination | WO8203928 | - FEINWERKTECHN. & MESSTECHN., Band 87, Nr. 4 Mai/Juni 1979, Seiten 163 - 169; H. Schemmann: "Zweipolige Einphasen-Synchronmotoren mit dauermagnetischem Läufer, Eigenschaften und Anwendung" |