EP0309839 - Process for the preparation of oxyethyl mercaptobenzaldehydes, and their oxidation products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papenfuhs, Theodor, Dr. Heinrich-Bleicher-Strasse 40 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | [1989/14] | Application number, filing date | 88115262.3 | 17.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | DE19873731763 | 22.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3731763 | [1989/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309839 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309839 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/19, C07C323/22, C07C315/02, C07C317/24, C07C317/22 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
C07C317/00 (EP,US);
C07C323/19 (KR);
C07C323/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/14] | C07C149/32, C07C147/103, C07C147/107, C07C147/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Oxethylmercapto-benzaldehyden und deren Oxidationsprodukten | [1989/14] | English: | Process for the preparation of oxyethyl mercaptobenzaldehydes, and their oxidation products | [1989/14] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'oxyéthylmercaptobenzaldéhydes et leurs produits d'oxydation | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, Band 67, 1984, Seiten 1316-1327; R. SCHWYZER et al.: "The CAMET and CASET links for the synthesis of protected oligopeptides and oligodeoxynucleotides on solid and soluble supports" |