EP0308870 - Electronic air-fuel ratio control apparatus in internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. No. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isezaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. No. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isezaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakaniwa, Shinpei JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. No. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Uchikawa, Akira JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. No. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe - Schmitz - Weber Patentanwälte Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 20 D-8022 Grünwald bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115400.9 | 20.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870236300 | 22.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23630087 | JP19870238957 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23895787 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308870 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308870 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308870 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/10, G01N27/56 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
F02D41/1475 (EP,US);
F02D41/146 (EP,US);
F02D41/1456 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | F02D41/14, F02D41/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/13] | Title | German: | Elektronische Steuerungsvorrichtung für das Kraftstoff-Luftverhältnis eines inneren Verbrennungsmotors | [1989/13] | English: | Electronic air-fuel ratio control apparatus in internal combustion engine | [1989/13] | French: | Dispositif de commande électronique de mélange air-carburant dans un moteur à combustion interne | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP58204365 ; | [E]EP0287097 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST [JP]); | [X]DE3700401 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]JPS62157252 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 55 (P-260)[1492], 13th March 1984, page 104 P 260; & JP-A-58 204 365 (NIHON DENSHI KIKI K.K.) 29-11-1983, & JP58204365 A 00000000 |