EP0310878 - Continuous process for the preparation of isobutyric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1989/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruppert, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Weedring 9 D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 02 /
Siegert, Hermann-Josef, Dr. Burkhardtstrasse 38 D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [1989/15] | Application number, filing date | 88115603.8 | 22.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | DE19873733729 | 06.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3733729 | [1989/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310878 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310878 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C53/124, C07C51/14 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
B01J19/2425 (EP);
B01J19/2465 (EP);
B01J19/26 (EP);
C07C51/14 (EP);
B01J2219/00085 (EP);
B01J2219/00162 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/14, C07C53/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/15] | Title | German: | Kontinuierliches Verfahren zur Herstellung von Isobuttersäure | [1989/15] | English: | Continuous process for the preparation of isobutyric acid | [1989/15] | French: | Procédé continu pour la préparation de l'acide isobutyrique | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0031886 [ ] (ROEHM GMBH [DE]); | DE3139653 [ ] (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) |