EP0310891 - Color scanner having monitoring apparatus capable of displaying a plurality of originals in parallel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.11.1992 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakade, Toshiaki Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | 02 /
Asada, Shinji Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | 03 /
Akiyama, Kazuya Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | 04 /
Yonezawa, Yasuharu Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co.. Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115702.8 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | JP19870240933 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: JP 24093387 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310891 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/3875 (EP,US);
H04N1/6011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/15] | Title | German: | Farbtaster mit Monitor zur gleichzeitigen Darstellung einer Vielzahl von Vorlagen | [1989/15] | English: | Color scanner having monitoring apparatus capable of displaying a plurality of originals in parallel | [1989/15] | French: | Scanner de couleurs et moniteur pour visualisation simultanée d'une multiplicité de documents | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/01] | 22.08.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4414636 [ ] (UEDA SADAO [JP], et al); | US4641197 [ ] (MIYAGI KEN [JP]); | GB2168567 [ ] (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | EP0198571 [ ] (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]); | DE3710524 [ ] (CANON KK [JP]) |