EP0310903 - Organosilicium compound thickener for oils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 D-45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaefer, Dietmar, Dr. Milchstrasse 40 D-4300 Essen 14 / DE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Klaus Ahornstrasse 47 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1989/15] | Application number, filing date | 88115776.2 | 24.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | DE19873734217 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3734217 | [1989/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0310903 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0310903 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310903 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10M119/30, C08G77/38 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/893 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,US);
C09K3/00 (EP,US);
C10M119/30 (EP,US);
C10M2229/04 (EP,US);
C10M2229/041 (EP,US);
C10M2229/042 (EP,US);
C10M2229/043 (EP,US);
C10M2229/044 (EP,US);
C10M2229/045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/15] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Organosilicium-Verbindungen zum Verdicken von Ölen | [1989/15] | English: | Organosilicium compound thickener for oils | [1989/15] | French: | Emploi de composés d'organosilicium comme agent épaississant pour huiles | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0177825 (BAYER AG [DE]) |