Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
23.12.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] |
19.09.1991 | First examination report | |
05.06.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |
18.10.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] |
18.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |