Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] |
31.03.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] |
06.10.1992 | First examination report | |
24.10.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] |
18.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |
18.02.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |