EP0310107 - Coaxial starter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isozumi, Shuzoo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Works No. 840, Chiyoda-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo / JP | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116170.7 | 30.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | JP19870248429 | 01.10.1987 Original published format: JP 24842987 | JP19870248430 | 01.10.1987 Original published format: JP 24843087 | JP19870252983 | 07.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25298387 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310107 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310107 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02N15/06 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
F02N15/066 (EP,US);
F02N11/00 (KR);
F02N15/023 (EP,US);
Y10T74/132 (EP,US);
Y10T74/137 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1989/14] | Title | German: | Koaxialer Anlasser | [1989/14] | English: | Coaxial starter | [1989/14] | French: | Démarreur coaxial | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB994887 (ESPANOLA MAGNETOS S A FEMSA FA); | [XP]WO8802567 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |