Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |
30.10.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] |
17.08.1989 | First examination report | |
20.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
08.05.1989 | Change - applicant | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] |
18.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |