Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0787682B | 20.09.1995 | B2 | JPH0191633 | 11.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24842987 | 01.10.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0643825B | 08.06.1994 | B2 | JPH0192573 | 11.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24843087 | 01.10.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0196468 | 14.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25298387 | 07.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0310107 | Global Dossier | 16.12.1992 | B1 | EP0310107 | 05.04.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP24842987 | 01.10.1987 | JP25298387 | 07.10.1987 | JP24843087 | 01.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3876738T | 13.05.1993 | T2 | DE3876738D1 | 28.01.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP24842987 | 01.10.1987 | JP25298387 | 07.10.1987 | JP24843087 | 01.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920000337B | 11.01.1992 | B1 | KR890006973 | 17.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24842987 | 01.10.1987 | JP25298387 | 07.10.1987 | JP24843087 | 01.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4907464 | 13.03.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24842987 | 01.10.1987 | JP25298387 | 07.10.1987 | JP24843087 | 01.10.1987 |