EP0362432 - Improvement of a method of mass analyzing a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.1991 [1991/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker Franzen Analytik GmbH Kattenturmer Heerstrasse 122 28277 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states Bruker Franzen Analytik GmbH Kattenturmer Heerstrasse 122 D-28277 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franzen, Jochen, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Helmer 17 D-2800 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Gabling, Reemt-Holger, Dr. Worpsweder Strasse 78 D-2800 Bremen / DE | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116599.7 | 07.10.1988 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362432 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
H01J49/424 (EP);
H01J49/4285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Methode zur Massenanalyse einer Probe | [1990/15] | English: | Improvement of a method of mass analyzing a sample | [1990/15] | French: | Amélioration d'une méthode d'analyse par spectrométrie de masses | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/22] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.11.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0202943 ; | [AD]EP0113207 ; | [AD]GB2180687 |