EP0311915 - Footwear reinforcement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUNLOP LIMITED Silvertown House Vincent Square London SW1P 2PL / GB | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrington, Robert 26 Baucher Drive Orrell Bootle Merseyside L20 6JF / GB | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Sparrow, Alvar Alfred, et al Invensys Intellectual Property, PO Box 8433 Redditch B98 0DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Sparrow, Alvar Alfred, et al BTR Group Patent & Trade Mark Service P.O. Box 504 Erdington Birmingham B24 9QH / GB | ||
Former [1989/16] | Moore, John Hamilton BTR Group Patent & Trade Mark Service P.O. Box 504 Erdington Birmingham B24 9QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88116611.0 | 07.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | GB19870023962 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: GB 8723962 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311915 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311915 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311915 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/42, A43B7/32 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
B29D35/061 (EP,US);
A43B7/32 (EP,US);
B29D35/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/16] | Title | German: | Verstärkungselement für Schuhwerk | [1989/16] | English: | Footwear reinforcement | [1989/16] | French: | Renforcement pour article chaussant | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3442032 (JONAS GILBERT F); | [A]DE2643237 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE2827059 (TOHO BESLON CO); | [A]DE2823099 (DESMA WERKE GMBH); | [A]EP0013197 (PLASTIC AUVERGNE [FR]); | [X]US4255825 (RIGON PIETRO L); | [X]GB2061172 (STALTERI F) |