EP0313906 - Screw for a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELMENHORSTER KORK-FABRIK ARTHUR LINCK GMBH & CO. KG Brendelweg 165 D-2870 Delmenhorst / DE | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linck, Edgar, Dipl.-Ing. Spitzwegstr. 18 D-2870 Delmenhorst / DE | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Wolfgang Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/18] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dr.Jur. Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Koppelstrasse 3 D-26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116774.6 | 10.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | DE19873736662 | 29.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3736662 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313906 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
B65D41/348 (EP);
B65D41/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Schraubkappe für den Verschluss eines Behälters | [1989/18] | English: | Screw for a container | [1989/18] | French: | Capsule à vis pour la fermeture d'un récipient | [1989/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 19.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/40] | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2310281 ; | [Y]US3514004 |