EP0315786 - Process for the preparation of a d-alfa-amino acid from the corresponding alfa-keto acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1992 [1992/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1989/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Tweel, Will J.J. Thorbeckestraat 152 NL-6702 BW Wageningen / NL | 02 /
Ogg, Ron L.H.P. Azaleastraat 32 NL-6163 CD Geleen / NL | 03 /
De Bont, Jan A.M. Lawickse allee 68 NL-6707 AK Wageningen / NL | [1989/20] | Application number, filing date | 88116999.9 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | NL19870002449 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: NL 8702449 | [1989/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315786 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/04, C12N9/10 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/1096 (EP);
C12P13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer d-alpha-Aminosäure aus der entsprechenden alpha-keto-Säure | [1989/20] | English: | Process for the preparation of a d-alfa-amino acid from the corresponding alfa-keto acid | [1989/20] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un acide aminé d-alpha à partir du céto-acide alpha correspondant | [1989/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/45] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0152275 ; | [Y]EP0186035 | [XD] - ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 144, 1986, pages 169-174, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; W.J.J. VAN DEN TWEEL et al.: "Microbial metabolism of D- and L-phenylglycine by Pseudomonas putida LW-4" | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, abstract no. 112983, Philadelphia, PA, US; W.J.J. VAN DEN TWEEL et al.: "The involvement of an enantioselective transaminase in the metabolism of D-3 and D-4 hydroxyphenylglycine in Pseudomonas-putida LW-4", & APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL. 1988. vol. 29, no. 2-3, 224-230 |