EP0313928 - Detection and control method for a moment of torsion and the speed difference of a rotational two-mass system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papiernik, Wolfgang, Dr. Eskiltunastrasse 9 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Tröndle, Hans-Peter, Dr. Südhang 14 D-8550 Forchheim/Kersbach / DE | [1989/18] | Application number, filing date | 88117026.0 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | DE19873736214 | 26.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3736214 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313928 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313928 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D13/62, H02P5/16 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
H02P29/0016 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41251 (EP,US);
Y10S388/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung und Regelung eines Federmoments sowie einer Differenzdrehzahl bei rotatorisch angetriebenen Zwei-Massen-Systemen | [1989/18] | English: | Detection and control method for a moment of torsion and the speed difference of a rotational two-mass system | [1989/18] | French: | Procédé de détection et de régulation du couple de torsion et de l'écart de la vitesse angulaire d'un système à deux masses entraîné en rotation | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Regelungstechnik, Vol. 26, No. 11, November 1978, Munchen, G. HEINRICH: "Drehzahlregelung von GS-Antrieben unter Verwendung eines Zustands- und Stoergroessen-Beobachters", Seiten 350-351; Figuren 1,2. |