EP0312059 - Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Ohazakadoma Kadoma, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Ikuo Pashimonzu Minami Ikuta 205, 4-7-6 Minami Ikuta Tama-ku Kawasaki / JP | 02 /
Furuya, Nobuaki 1-2-2-1009, Hakusan Aso-ku Kawasaki / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Yasuhiro Sankei Hausu D56, 763 Ootsuka Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kawabuchi, Masami 2710-157, Miho-cho Midori-ku Yokohama / JP | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/47] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/16] | Roth, Ronald, Dipl.-Ing. Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte Sendlinger Strasse 35 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117037.7 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | JP19870258865 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886587 | JP19870258866 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886687 | JP19870258863 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886387 | JP19870258864 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886487 | JP19870258867 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886787 | JP19870258868 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25886887 | JP19880147452 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14745288 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312059 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312059 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
G01S15/8984 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
G01S15/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/16] | Title | German: | Ultraschalldiagnostikgerät | [1989/16] | English: | Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus | [1989/16] | French: | Appareil diagnostique à ultrasons | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 15.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0081045 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]WO8502105 (ACOUSTEC PARTNERS [US]); | [Y]EP0144968 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3605164 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]); | [A]US4660565 (SHIRASAKA TOSHIO [JP]) |