EP0312933 - Fluoroborosilicate glass and clad article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNING GLASS WORKS Sullivan Park FR-212 Corning New York 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Sullivan Park FR-212 Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fine, Gerald Jonathan 23 West Sixth Street Corning New York / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117125.0 | 14.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | US19870111217 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: US 111217 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312933 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312933 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312933 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/064, C03C3/118, C03C13/04 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
C03C13/046 (EP);
C03C13/04 (KR);
C03C3/064 (EP);
C03C3/118 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/17] | Title | German: | Fluorborsilikatglas und beschichteter Gegenstand | [1989/17] | English: | Fluoroborosilicate glass and clad article | [1989/17] | French: | Verre fluoroborosilicaté et article revêtu | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3524605 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]); | [A]GB2051773 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]US3784386 (ARAUJO R, et al); | [AD]US3764354 (RITZE W, et al); | [AD]US2407874 (FRASER WALTER A) |