EP0312956 - Control unit of the bidirectional traverse of the cutting members in a machine to cut material in sheet form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/17] | Control unit of the bidirectional traverse of the cutting members in a machine to cut material in sheet | ||
[1994/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavagna, Elio P.zza Piemonte, 5 I-20077 Melegnano / IT | [1989/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. Via Ariberto 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. via G. Negri,10 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88117239.9 | 17.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | IT19870022403 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: IT 2240387 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312956 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312956 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312956 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
B26D7/2635 (EP,US);
Y10T83/659 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7822 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7847 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Überwachungseinheit zum Positionieren der Messer in einer Längsschneidvorrichtung | [1989/17] | English: | Control unit of the bidirectional traverse of the cutting members in a machine to cut material in sheet form | [1994/17] | French: | Unité de contrôle pour le positionnement des couteaux dans une machine à couper longitudinalement | [1989/17] |
Former [1989/17] | Control unit of the bidirectional traverse of the cutting members in a machine to cut material in sheet | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.04.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2441080 ; | [X]US4320677 (TAHARA YOSHINORI); | [A]DE3437995 (CAVAGNA ELIO SRL [IT]); | [Y]EP0167472 (BELOIT CORP [US]) |