Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |
12.06.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] |
26.07.1991 | First examination report | |
08.05.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] |
10.03.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |