Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0364616 | Global Dossier | 29.07.1992 | B1 | EP0364616 | 25.04.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP88117296 | 18.10.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3873341T | 07.01.1993 | T2 | DE3873341D1 | 03.09.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP88117296 | 18.10.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2034097T | 01.04.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP88117296 | 18.10.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4940186 | 10.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | EP88117296 | 18.10.1988 |